U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-11570
  • Case Name: James Edward Butler
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Change of Address (Misc Menu)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Court's Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order and Negative Notice Co-Debtor Stay (Chambers Only)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.