U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70644
  • Case Name: Evans Construction, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Corporate Resolution]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Employ (Motion)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Tax Documents]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Order Setting Status Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Court)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Authority]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 11)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (UST)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Small Business or SubV Designation]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Notice Appointing Ch. 11 Subchapter V Trustee]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Small Business Statement of Operations]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Small Business Statement of Operations]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.