U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-01109
  • Case Name: Endsley v. Collins et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extend Time]
  • May 05, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.