U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-05084
  • Case Name: Sherland v. Durrett et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Summons Reissued]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum Brief in Support]
  • April 30, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 17, 2025: [Magistrate Notice/Consent Form]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.