U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-bk-71851
  • Case Name: Russ Deleon Michael and Monika Monese Michael
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Entered]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Motion to Dismiss Case (Tr 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.