U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carney, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.