U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-05085
  • Case Name: Cranston et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Clerk's Order Dismissing Case/Party]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Party/Case)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum Brief in Support]
  • April 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2025: [Filing Fee Submitted]
  • April 17, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Magistrate Notice/Consent Form]
  • April 17, 2025: [Clerk's Notice Regarding Attorney Registration]
  • April 17, 2025: [Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.