U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70654
  • Case Name: David Sims and Vickey Lynn Sims
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (fee) (Case Upload)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan- case upload]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (fee) (Case Upload)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan- case upload]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.