U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-bk-70653
  • Case Name: Tammy Vickery and Mark Vickery
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.