U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-06066
  • Case Name: Griffin v. Trucking Martins, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Objection to Pre-Trial Disclosure Sheet]
  • May 02, 2025: [Objection to Pre-Trial Disclosure Sheet]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Pretrial Disclosure Sheet]
  • April 18, 2025: [Pretrial Disclosure Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.