U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-bk-70661
  • Case Name: Brittany McDaniel and Larry McDaniel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Memorandum of Document Deficiency]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.