U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-05086
  • Case Name: Belk, Inc. v. Scottsdale Center, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Deposit Funds]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Requested]
  • April 24, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 24, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: [Magistrate Notice/Consent Form]
  • April 21, 2025: [Clerk's Order of Judge Assignment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.