U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11326
  • Case Name: Rick Joshua Neal
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Ch. 13 Installment Payment]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Substitute Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt of Case Filing Fee]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Credit Counseling Not Filed]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Social Security Number (Form 121)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition (Ch. 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.