U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-bk-71063
  • Case Name: Danielle Nicole French
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Entered]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Withdrawing Objection (Tr 13)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Modified Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Modify Plan (Tr 13)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing Not Held (Courtroom)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.