U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-11357
  • Case Name: Misha Roshonda Shelly-Sanders
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.