U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-11381
  • Case Name: Robin Timothy Neal and Kimberley Brooke Neal
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Williams, Renee [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Williams, Renee [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Williams, Renee [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Williams, Renee [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Williams, Renee [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Williams, Renee [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Williams, Renee [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Williams, Renee [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Williams, Renee [Credit Counseling Certificate (Ch 12)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Ch 12)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Williams, Renee [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.