U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-bk-70685
  • Case Name: Jenifer Mejia
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Objection to Motion/Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [In Forma Pauperis/Waive Ch 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Social Security Number (Form 121)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Voluntary Petition (Ch 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.