U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10006-11
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 29, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 29, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 28, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 25, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 24, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 24, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 23, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 23, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • April 23, 2025: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.