open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:14-cv-00936
    Party Name:Anna Kihagi v. City of West Hollywood California
  • Filing Type:Civil [Non-Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reschedule]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?582307
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =