open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of California
    Case Number:14-20371
    Party Name:The Roman Catholic Bishop of Stockton, a Californi
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree (Certificate)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree and Close BK - 7, 11, 12, 13 (BNC)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Chapter 11 Case/for Final Decree (Order)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order for Judge's Signature]
    Date Published:June 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Chapter 11 Case/for Final Decree - Including Amended Motion]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Quarterly Post Confirmation Report - Including Amendments]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service (Claims)]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Order (Sua Sponte)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Confirming Plan - 9,11,12,13 (Sua Sponte)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Tabulation of Ballots]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Memorandum of Points and Authorities]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Brief/Memorandum]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Restrict/Redact/Seal (Order)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [EFILED RECEIPT - Motion Fee Paid (Redact)]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Filing Fee Paid]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Restrict/Redact/Seal - Including Amended Motion]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Hearing/Conference/Trial]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Request to be Removed from Mailing/Creditor List]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Withdrawal/Satisfaction of Claim]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ (Order)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Change of Name and/or Address]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Undeliverable Mail]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Disclosure Statement/Small Business Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended/Modified Plan - 9,11,12,13]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Court's Certificate of Mailing (via USPS) (Produces Form)]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Admission to Appear pro hac vice (Order)]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Admission to Practice pro hac vice - Including Amended Motion]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing (Hearing Not Calendared)]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Plan - 9,11,12,13]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Status Conference Statement]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion/Application - Including Amended Motion]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Service of Document (Certificate)]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Matter Held *]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Service of Document]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation (Order)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw As Attorney (Order)]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw As Attorney - Including Amended Motion]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Withdrawal/Satisfaction of Claim - Submitted Electronically]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Matter Continued *]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Status Report]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal (Not for Claims)]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Entry - CM - Proposed Order/Notice of Hearing Request by Telephone]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time - Including Amended Motion]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document - Including Amended]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Order]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report - Including Amendments]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ - Including Amended Motion]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation - Including Amended Motion]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit(s)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments]
    Date Published:December 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.caeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?540839
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =