open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:14-cv-01096
    Party Name:Jonathan Meister et al v. City of Hawthorne et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Exclude]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Preclude]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 09, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?582771
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =