open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:5:14-cv-00419
    Party Name:City of Huntington Park et al v. Landscape Structures et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certify Class Action]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 05, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?584211
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =