U.S. Federal Court Records for the Central District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Central District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:12-bk-27923-MH
  • Case Name: Shadinoel G. Armenta
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Proof of service]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 13 (after completion of chapter 13 plan - cases filed after 11/05/90)]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [BNC Certificate of Notice]
August, 2017
  • August 27, 2017: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Debtor's certification and application for entry of discharge - Chapter 13 (BNC)]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Notice of Intent to Increase Dividend to Unsecured Creditors (batch)]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • January 24, 2017: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Db Received Income From an Employer (LBR Form F1002-1)]
  • January 23, 2017: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Redact (for Protective Order to Restrict Access Pers. ID (LBR Form F9037-1.1) (Fee) (BNC-PDF)]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Notice of additional claims (Chapter 13) (batch)]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Hearing Held (Motion)]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • July 22, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Hearing Continued (Motion)]
  • July 16, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • July 08, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Notice of Lodgment]
  • July 08, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Stipulation (motion)]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Hearing Continued (Motion)]
  • May 27, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 13, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Notice]
  • May 12, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Hearing Continued (Motion)]
  • May 09, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Status report]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)]
  • April 11, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Notice of Lodgment]
  • April 11, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Stipulation (motion)]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 16, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Compensation (BNC-PDF)]
  • March 15, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Notice of Lodgment]
  • March 15, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3))]
  • March 11, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • March 09, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 07, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Hearing Continued (Motion)]
  • March 07, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)]
  • March 04, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Notice of Lodgment]
  • March 04, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Stipulation (motion)]
February, 2016
  • February 15, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) ]
  • February 10, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Compensation (motion)]
  • February 07, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • February 05, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Avoid Lien (BNC-PDF)]
  • February 03, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • February 02, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Declaration re: non opposition]
  • February 01, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Hearing Continued (Motion)]
  • February 01, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Notice of Lodgment]
  • January 28, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Stipulation (motion)]
  • January 13, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) ]
  • January 04, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Avoid Lien (motion)]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Hearing Set(Motion)]
  • December 22, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Objection to Claim (motion)]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired)]
  • November 06, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • November 04, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Avoid Lien (BNC-PDF)]
  • November 04, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)]
  • November 04, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Reconsider (BNC-PDF)]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Reconsider (motion)]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Schedule B (Offical Form B6B) - Personal Property]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Avoid Lien (motion)]
March, 2015
  • March 04, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cohen, (TR) Amrane (RS) [Notice of Change of Address (multi)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.