open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-01980
    Party Name:Jose Castro v. City of South Gate et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:March 19, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?613309
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =