open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-00725
    Party Name:John Nation v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Entry]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Exclude]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:March 27, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?609803
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =