open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:5:15-cv-00639
    Party Name:Michael Young v. City of Claremont et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for ADR Procedure No. 1 - (ADR-1)]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minutes]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 08, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?614830
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =