open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-02613
    Party Name:Travis Charles Brown v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Notice of Transfer of Case to a New Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent)]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?615508
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =