open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:10-cv-05040
    Party Name:Kwang-Wei Han v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Held and Continued]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference Order - Final]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Begun]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Exclude]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Non-Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 15, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?476985
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =