open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:14-cv-07366
    Party Name:Karyl Clarke v. City of Hawthorne et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:October 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Objection to R&R]
    Date Published:September 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment (Partial)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel Answers to Interrogatories]
    Date Published:August 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Intervene]
    Date Published:August 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Relief]
    Date Published:August 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waive]
    Date Published:August 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit (non-trial)]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Non-Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appointment of Counsel]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Lodged Complaint]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Special Master]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:April 28, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?599926
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =