open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:6:15-ap-01136-WJ
    Party Name:Farmers & Merchants Bank Of Long Beach v. Manzano
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Abstract of judgment]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired)]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Hearing Held (Motion)]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Notice of Lodgment]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Hearing Held (Other)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [X - Document (Generic)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Hearing Set(Motion)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Default Judgment (motion)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Notice of motion/application]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
    Date Published:May 05, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1702152
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =