open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-03463
    Party Name:United States of America v. Real Property Located in Tujunga, California
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Consent]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:December 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 08, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?617694
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =