open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:5:13-cv-00609
    Party Name:Farmers & Merchants Bank of Long Beach v. Ronald C Willemsen et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Abstract of Judgment issued]
    Date Published:May 11, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?558667
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =