open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:14-cv-04991
    Party Name:Greg Millan v. City of Montebello
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?593181
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =