open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-05470
    Party Name:Maria Antonia Barrera v. City of Lynwood et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment (Partial)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?623310
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =