open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-06089
    Party Name:Crown Castle NG West LLC v. City of Malibu, a Municipal Corporation et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:March 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?625258
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =