open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-06099
    Party Name:Arturo Solorzano v. City of Lynwood et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joinder (Motion Related)]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand Case to State Court]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for ADR Procedure No. 1 - (ADR-1)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?625292
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =