open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-07807
    Party Name:Crystal Smith et al v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for ADR Procedure No. 3 - (ADR-1)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?629812
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =