open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:11-cv-00120
    Party Name:Alejandro Velazquez Hernandez v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Bifurcate]
    Date Published:April 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Exclude]
    Date Published:April 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?491272
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =