open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-08309
    Party Name:Los Angeles SMSA Limited Partnership v. City of Walnut
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for ADR Procedure No. 1 - (ADR-1)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment (Partial)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?631098
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =