open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-08312
    Party Name:Alejandro Figueroa Yarbrough v. City of Long Beach
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer Pursuant to GO 14-03 DECLINED-(related case)(CV 34)]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?631109
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =