open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-08440
    Party Name:Aimee Vasquez et al v. City of Lancaster et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Review of Discovery Matter]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Adjudication]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave For In Camera Review]
    Date Published:September 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing re Discovery Matter]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)]
    Date Published:September 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery]
    Date Published:September 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?631524
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =