open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:12-cv-08051
    Party Name:Hector Navarro et al v. Mercedes Benz of Encino
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Staying Case]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)]
    Date Published:October 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?542984
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =