open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-08811
    Party Name:Sean Galindo v. The City of Hawthorne et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:March 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?632747
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =