open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-08859
    Party Name:James Jacobsen v. City of Calabasas et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joinder]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?632868
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =