open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-00804
    Party Name:Frank Lindsay et al v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minutes]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Reference/Discovery purs LR 83-1.3.1 (Related Case)(CV 34a)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?633619
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =