open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-00831
    Party Name:Raheem Karriem v. Long Beach, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV-93)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?639649
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =