open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-00460
    Party Name:Frank Lindsay et al v. City of Norwalk et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?638266
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =