open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:8:16-cv-00355
    Party Name:Aurelia White v. City of Norwalk California Housing Authority
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitution of Attorney -- GRANTED]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?641358
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =