U.S. Federal Court Records for the Central District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Central District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-bk-10879-MB
  • Case Name: Pearl Ruby Guitron
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Close Bankruptcy Case (CACB AutoClose)]
  • July 05, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Certification About a Financial Management Course for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423)]
March, 2016
  • March 27, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Per Part 5 of Voluntary Petition)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR F1007-1)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Official Form 122A-1) (BNC Option)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Db Received Income From an Employer (LBR Form F1002-1)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Statement of Financial Affairs (Official Form 107 or 207)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Official Form 106Dec)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Schedule J: Your Expenses (Official Form 106J)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Schedule I: Your Income (Official Form 106I)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Schedule C: The Property You Claimed as Exempt (Official Form 106C)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) ]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) (I/J No POC)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121)]
  • March 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zamora, (TR) Nancy J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.