open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-bk-14311-TD
    Party Name:Ariane Bellamar and Tanner Slaught
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Dism for failure to appear at 341(a) mtg (Order/Notice) (Option A or Option B) (BNC)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Relief from stay - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Relief from stay -ACTION IN NON-BK FORUM (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Notice of Lodgment]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Relief - Unlawful Detainer (motion)]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Hearing Set(Motion)]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Proof of service]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Relief - Action in Non-Bankruptcy Forum (motion)]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) ]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Db Received Income From an Employer (LBR Form F1002-1)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) (I/J No POC)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Per Part 5 of Voluntary Petition)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolkowitz, (TR) Edward M [Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1743269
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =